WI SB251 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-17 - Published 11-25-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-17 - Published 11-25-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 814.625 of the statutes; relating to: costs of transporting by ferry an arrested person.
Title
Costs of transporting by ferry an arrested person.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Jauch [D] | Rep. Gary Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-17 | Published 11-25-2009. | |
2009-11-12 | Report approved by the Governor on 11-12-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 72 | |
2009-11-10 | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2009 | |
2009-11-06 | Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2009 | |
2009-11-04 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-03 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-03 | Representative Bies added as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-29 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-07 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-07 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-10-06 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-23 | Public hearing held | |
2009-08-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-08-05 | Introduced |