WI SB238 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (3n) (a) 1m. (intro.), 36.27 (3n) (am), 36.27 (3n) (bd), 38.24 (7) (a) 1m. (intro.), 38.24 (7) (am) and 38.24 (7) (bd); and to create 36.27 (3n) (a) 1m. c. and 38.24 (7) (a) 1m. c. of the statutes; Relating to: tuition and fee remission for eligible veterans' spouses and children enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Title
Tuition and fee remission for eligible veterans' spouses and children enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-02 | House | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 3 |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |