WI SB236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: directing the federal COVID recovery rebates received by prisoners to restitution payments.
Title
Directing the federal COVID recovery rebates received by prisoners to restitution payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Representative Sortwell added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |