WI SB229 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (fm), 71.07 (9) (cm), 71.07 (11) and 71.54 (2s) of the statutes; Relating to: a tax credit for certain property tax increases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A tax credit for certain property tax increases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |