WI SB229 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 227.137 (3) (c) of the statutes; relating to: inclusion in the economic impact analysis for a proposed rule an assessment of the impact that the proposed rule will have on public health and the environment. (FE)
Title
Inclusion in the economic impact analysis for a proposed rule an assessment of the impact that the proposed rule will have on public health and the environment. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb229 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB229.pdf |