WI SB218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.445 (1) (b), 106.27 (2g) (a) 2. and 106.27 (3); and to create 106.27 (1y) of the statutes; Relating to: reimbursement grants to employers for payment of costs for certification programs in solar energy and wind energy systems. (FE)
Title
Reimbursement grants to employers for payment of costs for certification programs in solar energy and wind energy systems. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb218 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB218.pdf |