WI SB215 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Published 3-24-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Published 3-24-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.11 (45) of the statutes; relating to: a personal property tax exemption for snowmobile clubs.
Title
A personal property tax exemption for snowmobile clubs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Published 3-24-2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-10-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 155 | |
2010-03-09 | Presented to the Governor on 3-9-2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Report correctly enrolled on 3-4-2010 | |
2010-02-26 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-25 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-02-25 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-25 | Representative Molepske Jr. added as a cosponsor | |
2010-02-25 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up | |
2010-02-16 | Representative Suder added as a cosponsor | |
2009-12-15 | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-03 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-11-03 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-29 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-27 | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties | |
2009-10-27 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-27 | Senator A. Lasee added as a coauthor | |
2009-10-26 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2009-10-26 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-10-26 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-10-22 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Holperin | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-21 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-21 | Referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-21 | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions received | |
2009-10-21 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-29 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2009-09-23 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-23 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | |
2009-09-23 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-23 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-23 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-17 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-16 | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Holperin | |
2009-09-16 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Holperin | |
2009-08-26 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Holperin | |
2009-08-18 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-20 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-05-20 | Introduced |