WI SB208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 76.638 (2); and to create 76.638 (2) (b) and 76.638 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: allocation of early stage seed investment credit to offset taxes imposed on insurers. (FE)
Title
Allocation of early stage seed investment credit to offset taxes imposed on insurers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 61 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-13 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-7-2019 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (1)(a) |
2019-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 9 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |