WI SB207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.887 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for local wildlife control grants.
Title
Eligibility for local wildlife control grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Senate | Published 12-7-2023 |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 50 |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |