WI SB206 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 118.07 (1); and to create 118.07 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: maintaining a supply of usable opioid antagonist at a school. (FE)
Title
Maintaining a supply of usable opioid antagonist at a school. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |