WI SB198 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.15 (3) (f) 2.; and to create 348.15 (3) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: weight limit exceptions for vehicles equipped with idle reduction technology or natural gas fuel systems. (FE)
Title
Weight limit exceptions for vehicles equipped with idle reduction technology or natural gas fuel systems. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 85 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |