WI SB180 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 6.22 (6) and 7.15 (1) (j); to amend 6.03 (1) (a), 6.03 (3), 6.18 (intro.), 6.25 (1) (c), 6.25 (4), 6.79 (2) (d), 6.82 (1) (a), 6.875 (3) (b), 6.97 (1), 7.15 (1) (cm), 7.52 (3) (a), 9.10 (2) (e) 6. and 12.60 (1) (a); and to create 12.13 (3) (mb) of the statutes; Relating to: absentee voting, voting procedures, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Absentee voting, voting procedures, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |