WI SB175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 846.167 (title) and (1) and 846.17; to renumber 846.167 (2) (a) and 846.167 (2) (c); to renumber and amend 846.16 (1), 846.16 (2), 846.16 (3), 846.167 (2) (intro.), 846.167 (2) (b) and 846.167 (3); to amend 77.22 (1), 846.10 (2) (a) 1., 846.10 (2) (a) 2. a., 846.10 (2) (a) 2. b., 846.101 (2) (b), 846.101 (2) (c) 1., 846.101 (2) (c) 2., 846.102 (3) (a) 1., 846.103 (1) and (2) and 846.16 (title); and to create 846.16 (1) (title), 846.16 (1) (c) 3., 846.16 (2m) (title), 846.16 (3m) (title), 846.16 (3m) (a) 1. and 2., 846.16 (3m) (b) and 846.16 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: procedures related to a sale of foreclosed property by a sheriff or referee.
Title
Procedures related to a sale of foreclosed property by a sheriff or referee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb175 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB175.pdf |