WI SB173 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.396 (1), 48.396 (2) (a), 938.396 (1) (a), 938.396 (2) and 938.396 (2g) (c); and to create 938.396 (2m) of the statutes; relating to: the disclosure of electronic juvenile court records to law enforcement agencies and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The disclosure of electronic juvenile court records to law enforcement agencies and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 270 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:51 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-03-02 | House | Representative Richards added as a cosponsor |
2012-03-02 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-22 | House | LRB correction |
2012-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 2 adopted |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2011-09-19 | Senate | Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-08-30 | Senate | Introduced |