WI SB17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Representatives Stubbs and Bowen added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 940.19 (6) (a); to renumber 813.125 (1) (am) 1. and 813.125 (1) (am) 2.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 940.19 (6) (intro.) and (b); to amend 48.57 (3p) (g) 2., 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 1., 103.34 (1) (b) 2., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 303.07 (2), 813.123 (1) (eg), 813.125 (1) (am) (intro.), 895.45 (1) (a), 911.01 (4) (c), 938.208 (1) (a), 938.34 (4m) (b) 1., 938.355 (2d) (b) 3., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.20 (title), 968.20 (1), 968.20 (1h), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.035 (1), 969.08 (10) (b), 973.01 (2) (c) 2. a., 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. a., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. b., 973.123 (1) and 980.01 (6) (b); and to create 343.12 (7) (c) 9j., 813.12 (1) (ar), 813.12 (5b), 813.123 (6g), 813.125 (1) (am) 3., 813.125 (1) (am) 4. (intro.), 813.125 (5b), 939.623, 940.198, 940.225 (1) (d) and 971.109 of the statutes; Relating to: increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseRepresentatives Stubbs and Bowen added as cosponsors
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-02-16SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-02-16SenateRead a second time
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-02-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-02-12SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2021-02-12SenateExecutive action taken
2021-02-11SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
2021-02-11SenatePublic hearing held
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback