WI SB17 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 446.028 of the statutes; Relating to: continuing education program sponsors for chiropractors, chiropractic technicians, and chiropractic radiological technicians. (FE)
Title
Continuing education program sponsors for chiropractors, chiropractic technicians, and chiropractic radiological technicians. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Representative R. Brooks withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb17 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB17.pdf |