WI SB162 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 895.527 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: operation of certain existing sport shooting ranges.
Title
Operation of certain existing sport shooting ranges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | Published 7-6-2013 |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-5-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 35 |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-3-2013 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-10 | House | Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-31 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2013-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2013-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |