WI SB162 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.50 (4); to repeal and recreate 343.50 (4); and to create 343.14 (2) (j) of the statutes; relating to: notice of the fee for identification cards issued by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Title
Notice of the fee for identification cards issued by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-08-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb162 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB162.pdf |