WI SB161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 345.24 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: release of person after arrest for operating a motor vehicle while intoxicated. (FE)
Title
Release of person after arrest for operating a motor vehicle while intoxicated. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb161 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB161.pdf |