WI SB160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.10 (1); and to create 175.10 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: sales by the state or a political subdivision to employees. (FE)
Title
Sales by the state or a political subdivision to employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-27 | Senate | Published 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 65 |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |