WI SB149 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.225 (5) (b) 1. c. and 948.01 (5) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: definition of “sexual contact” for purposes of crimes against children and sexual assault and providing a penalty.
Title
Definition of “sexual contact” for purposes of crimes against children and sexual assault and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Senator James added as a coauthor |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |