WI SB139 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.185 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a statewide wolf population goal.
Title
Establishing a statewide wolf population goal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:05 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2024-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced |