WI SB126 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 51.13 (1) (c) 2. and 3.; to renumber and amend 51.13 (1) (c) 1.; to amend 51.13 (1) (title), 51.13 (1) (a) and (b), 51.13 (3) (b), 51.13 (4) (title), 51.13 (4) (a) (intro.) and 6., 51.13 (4) (d), 51.13 (4) (g) (intro.) and 1. c., 51.13 (6) (a) 3., 51.13 (7) (b) 1. to 3., 51.35 (3) (a) and (b) and 51.61 (6); and to create 51.13 (1) (bm), 51.13 (1) (d) (title), 51.13 (1) (e) (title), 51.13 (1) (em) (title), 51.13 (3) (am) (title), 51.13 (3) (b) (title), 51.13 (3) (d) (title), 51.13 (3) (e) (title), 51.13 (4) (b) (title), 51.13 (4) (c) (title), 51.13 (4) (e) (title), 51.13 (4) (f) (title), 51.13 (4) (g) 4., 51.13 (4) (h) (title), 51.13 (4) (i) (title), 51.13 (6) (a) (title), 51.13 (6) (b) (title), 51.13 (6) (c) (title), 51.13 (7) (a) (title), 51.13 (7) (b) (title) and 51.13 (7) (c) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: admission of minors for inpatient treatment. (FE)
Title
Admission of minors for inpatient treatment. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb126 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB126.pdf |