WI SB121 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 632.895 (8) (a) 1.; to renumber and amend 632.895 (8) (d); to amend 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 609.80; and to create 49.46 (2) (b) 6. n., 632.895 (8) (a) 1c., 632.895 (8) (a) 1e., 632.895 (8) (a) 1g., 632.895 (8) (a) 1n., 632.895 (8) (a) 1r., 632.895 (8) (a) 4., 632.895 (8) (a) 5., 632.895 (8) (a) 6., 632.895 (8) (am), 632.895 (8) (d) 2. and 632.895 (8) (d) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: coverage of breast cancer screenings by the Medical Assistance program and health insurance policies and plans. (FE)
Title
Coverage of breast cancer screenings by the Medical Assistance program and health insurance policies and plans. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-10 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Representative Donovan added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senator Roys added as a coauthor |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |