WI SB117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 62.13 (3); to renumber and amend 62.13 (1), 62.50 (1h) and 62.50 (6); to amend 19.42 (7w) (c), 60.57 (2), 61.65 (3g) (d) 1. a., 62.13 (2) (a), 62.13 (6m) (intro.), 62.50 (21) and 62.51 (1) (a); to repeal and recreate 62.50 (1e); and to create 62.13 (1b), 62.13 (1m) (a) 2., 62.13 (1m) (d), 62.13 (1m) (e), 62.13 (3) (b), 62.13 (3) (c), 62.13 (3) (d), 62.13 (3m), 62.50 (1h) (b), 62.50 (1h) (f) 1., 62.50 (1h) (f) 3., 62.50 (5g), 62.50 (5m), 62.50 (6) (b), 62.50 (6) (c) and 62.50 (21m) of the statutes; Relating to: boards of police and fire commissioners and protective services departments in populous cities. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards of police and fire commissioners and protective services departments in populous cities. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-17SenateFailed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
2022-05-17SenatePlaced on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
2022-03-31SenateReport vetoed by the Governor on 3-31-2022
2022-03-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-28-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader
2022-01-28SenateReport correctly enrolled
2022-01-26SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2022-01-25HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2022-01-25HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2022-01-25HouseRules suspended
2022-01-25HouseOrdered to a third reading
2022-01-25HouseRead a second time
2022-01-25HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2022-01-20HousePlaced on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules
2021-12-07HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-10-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-06-17HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended
2021-05-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 21, Noes 12
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 21, Noes 12
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, L. Taylor and Johnson
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, L. Taylor, Carpenter and Johnson
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-07SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2021-05-07SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2021-05-06SenateExecutive action taken
2021-05-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
2021-04-30SenateRepresentative Schraa added as a cosponsor
2021-04-13SenateLRB correction
2021-03-18SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-02-18SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb117
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB117.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/SB117.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB117-SSA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB117-SSA1-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB117-SSA1-SA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb117/sb117_dor.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/judiciary_and_public_safety/1615242.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB117.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0061
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0062
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0063

Bill Comments

feedback