WI SB117 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 236.45 (3); and to create 236.45 (3) (b) of the statutes; relating to: extraterritorial plat approval on basis of land's use.
Title
Extraterritorial plat approval on basis of land's use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-04 | Report passage recommended by committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-23 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rural Issues, Biofuels, and Information Technology | |
2009-03-17 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb117 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB117.pdf |