WI SB116 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 767.461; and to create 767.34 (3), 767.41 (5m), 767.451 (3r) and 767.461 (1) to (4) of the statutes; Relating to: modifications to legal custody or physical placement contingent upon a future event.
Title
Modifications to legal custody or physical placement contingent upon a future event.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Published 3-27-2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-26-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 20 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-25-2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Read a second time |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-03 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |