WI SB1041 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.07 (11) and 71.10 (4) (dm) of the statutes; Relating to: a tax credit for local newspaper subscriptions. (FE)
Title
A tax credit for local newspaper subscriptions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced |