WI SB101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.02 (2) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: first-degree reckless homicide and providing a penalty.
Title
First-degree reckless homicide and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-07 | Senate | Published 8-5-2023 |
2023-08-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 29 |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Read a second time |
2023-06-07 | House | Representatives Sapik and Dittrich added as cosponsors |
2023-06-01 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-01 | House | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 3 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |