WI AR17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: designating the week of May 2, 2021, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.
Title
Designating the week of May 2, 2021, as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-03 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/resolution/ar17 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AR17.pdf |