WI AJR53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: an advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
An advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-27 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2017-09-07 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2017-09-05 | House | Representative Zepnick added as a coauthor |
2017-07-19 | House | Representative Young added as a coauthor |
2017-05-22 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2017-05-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr53 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AJR53.pdf |