WI AJR49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and service of Pastor Jerome Smith Sr.
Title
Honoring the life and service of Pastor Jerome Smith Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4 |
2021-08-04 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 8-4-2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-18-2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-11 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-06 | House | Representatives Stubbs and Steineke added as coauthors |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Introduced |