WI AJR47 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-8)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-12-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-8)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-12-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing May 2023 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing May 2023 as Law Enforcement Appreciation Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-12-2023 |
2023-06-07 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-05-17 | House | Representatives Emerson, Stubbs and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2023-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-17 | House | Senator Tomczyk added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-16 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to calendar of 5-17-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2023-05-15 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-05-15 | House | Introduced |