WI AJR4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Felmers O. Chaney.
Title
The life and public service of Felmers O. Chaney.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2 |
2013-03-07 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-4-2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Concurred in |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-12 | House | Representatives Barca, Bernard Schaber, Bewley, Billings, Clark, Danou, Doyle, Genrich, Hebl, Hintz, Kolste, Pope, Ringhand, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Smith, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Wachs, Wright and Kaufert added as coauthors |
2013-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced |