WI AJR35 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-14 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-14 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: declaring Public Works Week.
Title
Declaring Public Works Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-14-2013 |
2013-06-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Concurred in |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-11-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-08 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-08 | House | Introduced |