WI AJR135 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: applying to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment establishing term limits for members of the United States House of Representatives and the United States Senate.
Title
Applying to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for a convention to propose an amendment establishing term limits for members of the United States House of Representatives and the United States Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Drake, Bowen, Haywood, Stubbs, L. Myers, Baldeh, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, Spreitzer, Hebl, Subeck, Hesselbein, Vining, Brostoff, Considine, Emerson, B. Meyers, Ohnstad, Anderson, Hong, Conley, Hintz, Riemer, Andraca, McGuire, Shankland, Snodgrass, S. Rodriguez, Shelton, Pope, Vruwink, Goyke, Doyle, Milroy, Ortiz-Velez, Cabrera and Billings |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:41 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2022-02-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced |