WI AJR131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative Bonnie Ladwig.
Title
Honoring the life and public service of Representative Bonnie Ladwig.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 8 |
2022-03-09 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-9-2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-1-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Concurred in by unanimous rising vote |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Move to call the question |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-17-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced |