WI AJR121 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming June 7, 2024, as Upper Mississippi River National Wildlife and Fish Refuge Day.
Title
Proclaiming June 7, 2024, as Upper Mississippi River National Wildlife and Fish Refuge Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R] |
Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Sen. Brad Pfaff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr121 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/AJR121.pdf |