WI AJR119 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating the University of Wisconsin-Milwaukee Panthers men's basketball team on its 2014 Horizon League title and berth to the 2014 NCAA Men's Division I basketball tournament.
Title
Congratulating the University of Wisconsin-Milwaukee Panthers men's basketball team on its 2014 Horizon League title and berth to the 2014 NCAA Men's Division I basketball tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurred in |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar 3-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced |