WI AB981 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.715, 440.62 (3) (ag) 4m., 440.62 (3) (ar) 7m., 440.62 (4) (a) 2m., 440.62 (4) (b) 2m., 440.62 (4) (c) 2m., 440.62 (5) (b) 1m. and 440.62 (5) (b) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: instruction on human trafficking in licensed schools of barbering, schools of cosmetology, and specialty schools. (FE)
Title
Instruction on human trafficking in licensed schools of barbering, schools of cosmetology, and specialty schools. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Stubbs |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-05 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stubbs and Goeben |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-23 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-23 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1) |
2024-01-23 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2024-01-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stubbs and Goeben |
2024-01-22 | House | Representative Binsfeld added as a coauthor |
2024-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stubbs and Goeben |
2024-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced |