WI AB972 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.71 (1) and 944.32; and to create 939.6175 of the statutes; Relating to: solicitation for prostitution and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Solicitation for prostitution and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-19 | House | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced |