WI AB948 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10., 76.67 (2) and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.07 (5p), 71.10 (4) (ce), 71.28 (5p), 71.30 (3) (ce), 71.47 (5p), 71.49 (1) (ce), 76.634 and 560.295 of the statutes; relating to: an income and franchise tax credit for investments in a community development financial institution and granting rule-making authority.
Title
An income and franchise tax credit for investments in a community development financial institution and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business, Ayes 12, Noes 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-19 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Hilgenberg | |
2010-04-14 | Public hearing held | |
2010-04-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business | |
2010-04-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab948 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB948.pdf |