WI AB92 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 943.23 (2) and 943.23 (3); and to create 943.23 (1r), 943.23 (2) (b) and 943.23 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: carjacking offenses and providing criminal penalties.
Title
Carjacking offenses and providing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] |
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from joint review committee on Criminal Penalties and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2017-10-03 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties |
2017-05-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 3 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab92 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB92.pdf |