WI AB918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 194.41 (6) (b) 2. and 349.24; to renumber 194.41 (6) (b) 1., subchapter IV (title) of chapter 440 [precedes 440.40], 440.41, 440.42, 440.425, 440.43, 440.435, 440.44, 440.445, 440.45, 440.455, 440.46, 440.48 and 440.495; to renumber and amend 440.40, 440.415, 440.465 and 440.49; to amend 121.53 (5) (c), 194.01 (1), 194.01 (2), 340.01 (23g) (b) 4., 346.935 (4) (b) and 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.); and to create 440.08 (2) (a) 69., chapter 474 (title) and subchapter I of chapter 474 [precedes 474.10] of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of taxicab companies and taxicab dispatch services, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of taxicab companies and taxicab dispatch services, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Genrich, C. Taylor, Subeck, Riemer and Hebl |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knodl |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:21 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2018-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2018-02-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced |