WI AB877 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2021-22 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2021-22 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced |