WI AB85 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 66.0501 (4); to amend 7.30 (2) (a) and 60.37 (4) (a); and to create 66.0501 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing a local public official to serve as an election official.
Title
Allowing a local public official to serve as an election official.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 326 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Bernier added as a coauthor |
2017-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced |