WI AB828 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: additional compensation and recruitment and retention benefits for correctional officers, youth counselors, and psychiatric care technicians.
Title
Additional compensation and recruitment and retention benefits for correctional officers, youth counselors, and psychiatric care technicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-1-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Pfaff |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 33 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 34 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Andraca, Baldeh, Billings, Brostoff, Cabrera, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hong, McGuire, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Ortiz-Velez, Pope, Riemer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Senator Felzkowski added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 7, Noes 3 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-11 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-01-10 | House | LRB correction |
2022-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2022-01-07 | House | Introduced |