WI AB824 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.436 (2) (a) and 115.436 (3) (a); and to create 115.436 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: sparsity aid.
Title
Sparsity aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 305 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:59 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced |