WI AB800 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 945.01 (1) (b) and 945.01 (5) (am); and to create chapter 570 of the statutes; Relating to: fantasy games and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Fantasy games and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab800 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB800.pdf |