WI AB80 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 227.26 (4) and 227.29 of the statutes; Relating to: review by state agencies of administrative rules and enactments and an expedited process for repealing rules an agency no longer has the authority to promulgate. (FE)
Title
Review by state agencies of administrative rules and enactments and an expedited process for repealing rules an agency no longer has the authority to promulgate. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education Reform and Government Operations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Barca, Zamarripa, Shankland and Hebl |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Kahl, Bowen, Brostoff, Stuck, Kolste, Hesselbein and Genrich |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Kahl, Bowen, Brostoff, Stuck and Kolste |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-03-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Heaton added as a coauthor |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced |